Smylie, Janet Kathleen (CPSO#: 66806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Urban Health Solutions
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Seventh Generation Midwives Toronto
525 Dundas Street East
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M6G 3A8
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-7468
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET KATHLEEN SMYLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYLIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995