Smylie, Michael George Boag (CPSO#: 65769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1992


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Leicester, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11560 University Avenue
Edmonton AB  T6G 1Z2
Phone: (780) 432-8757
Fax: (780) 432-8888

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories


Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MICHAEL GEORGE BOAG SMYLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYLIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992