Smyth, Catherine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 70041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chronic Pain Clinic
CCW Room 1550
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8949
Fax: (613) 739-6296
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Smyth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Smyth ( CPSO# 70041 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELIZABETH SMYTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYTH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001