Smyth, Harley Sandwith (CPSO#: 25499)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Mar 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 1973

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
Queensway Site
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: 416 521 4196
Fax: (416) 521 4082
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 16 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARLEY SANDWITH SMYTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYTH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1973

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)