Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Smyth, William-Lee Raymond (CPSO#: 65618)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-4540 Ext. 3304
Fax: (705) 773-4634
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W-L. R. Smyth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Smyth ( CPSO# 65618 )

Business Address:
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-4540

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 12 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM-LEE RAYMOND SMYTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYTH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993