Smythe, Donna Elizabeth (CPSO#: 54234)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
3101 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M8X 2W2
Phone: (416) 231-5200
Fax: (416) 231-8369
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donna E. Smythe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Smythe ( CPSO# 54234 )

Business Address:
408 - 3101 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M8X 2W2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Ophthalmology Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA ELIZABETH SMYTHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYTHE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986