Smythe, John Francis (CPSO#: 54661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: (613) 548-1368
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3547
Fax: (613) 548-1368
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Smythe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Smythe ( CPSO# 54661 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Watkins 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 06 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN FRANCIS SMYTHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYTHE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989