Snaiderman, Abraham (CPSO#: 61592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: Snaiderman, Abraham Hass (used until: 19 Aug 1992 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehabilitation Inst.
University Health Network
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 3769
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Snaiderman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Snaiderman ( CPSO# 61592 )

Business Address:
Toronto Rehabilitation Inst.
550 University Avenue
Room East 10-123
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABRAHAM SNAIDERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNAIDERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991