Sne, Niv (CPSO#: 72489)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of General Surgery
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 44665
Fax: (905) 524-2424
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

GHA Surgical Centre
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: 9055755743
Fax: 9055757711
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Niv Sne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sne ( CPSO# 72489 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIV SNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2004