Snelgrove, Ryan Carl (CPSO#: 99600)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 19 Nov 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2013 to 11 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016