Snider, James Howard (CPSO#: 18798)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Dec 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2013