Snider, Stacey Lynn (CPSO#: 74911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avon Family Medicine Centre
511 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T8
Phone: (519) 508-1212
Fax: (519) 508-1240
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stacey L. Snider Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Snider ( CPSO# 74911 )

Business Address:
Avon Family Medicine Centre
511 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T8
Phone Number: (519) 508-1212

Business Address:
46 General Hopstial Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 271-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STACEY LYNN SNIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 17 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2003