Snider-Adler, Melissa Anne (CPSO#: 71631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Nov 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: Snider, Melissa Anne (used until: 31 Oct 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
777 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa ON  L1H 4K5
Phone: (905) 721-0003
Fax: 905-721-0618
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

32 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa ON  L1H 4G2
Canada
Phone: 905-720-0506
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1 Manley Street
Ayr ON  N0B 1E0
Canada
Phone: 800-463-4310
Fax: 519-632-7049
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Snider-Adler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Snider-Adler ( CPSO# 71631 )

Business Address:
32 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa ON  L1H 4G2
Phone Number: (905) 720-0506

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA ANNE SNIDER-ADLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNIDER-ADLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1999