Sniderman, Jacob Boruch (CPSO#: 19567)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Dec 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1991