Sniderman, Jonathan David Stobo (CPSO#: 102846)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric
Critical Care Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6484
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN DAVID STOBO SNIDERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNIDERMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 28 May 2014
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2017