Snihura, Robert (CPSO#: 22810)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016