Snodgrass, Graham Peter (CPSO#: 23984)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Peter Snodgrass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 31 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 May 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1968 to 01 Jul 1969
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 2014