Snow, Debbie Gail (CPSO#: 62492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medisys
333 Bay St., Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone: (416) 364-3008
Fax: 416 362-2018
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBBIE GAIL SNOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1991