Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Snowdon, Bruce Allen (CPSO#: 51797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 354
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 252-4209
Fax: (519) 252-0262
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Snowdon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Snowdon ( CPSO# 51797 )

Business Address:
Leamington District Memorial Hospital
194 Talbot Street
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 326-2373

Business Address:
354 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 252-4209

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE ALLEN SNOWDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNOWDON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1983