Snyder, Donna Albina (CPSO#: 28841)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 04 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Safe-Stor Fonthill, ON L0S 1E6 Tel: 905 892 0010
Date Received: 28 Aug 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Mar 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Apr 2017