Snyder, Douglas Ross (CPSO#: 66507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302,
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 578-8050
Fax: (519) 578-9955
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas R. Snyder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Snyder ( CPSO# 66507 )

Business Address:
302 - 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 578-8050

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS ROSS SNYDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNYDER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995