So, Derek Yiu Fai (CPSO#: 71596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Cardiology
Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7332
Fax: (613) 696-7128
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek So Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. So ( CPSO# 71596 )
Dr. J. Shiau ( CPSO# 70057 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa- Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Suite H3408
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-5387

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 11 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK YIU FAI SO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2004