So, Jeffrey Shulin (CPSO#: 84521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 250
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 815-0755
Fax: (905) 815-0757
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West GTA Endoscopy
2225 Erin Mills Parkway, Unit 183
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Canada
Phone: 905-823-0223
Fax: 905-823-9780
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: 905-845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey So Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. So ( CPSO# 84521 )
Dr. S. Chan ( CPSO# 84353 )

Business Address:
Suite 250
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 815-0755

Business Address:
183 - 2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Sheridan Centre
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Phone Number: (905) 823-0223

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY SHULIN SO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010