So, Joyce (CPSO#: 76366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Adult Genetics
UHN and Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4220
Fax: (416) 619-5523
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOYCE SO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2010