Soares, Mark Anthony (CPSO#: 64538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratory Medicine
The Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7661
Fax: (905) 848-8313
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

DEPT OF LAB MEDICINE
OAKVILLE TRAFALGAR MEMORIA HOSPITAL
3001 HOSPITAL GATE
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Soares Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 7 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ANTHONY SOARES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOARES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 20 Aug 1993
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1996 to 31 Mar 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1997