Sobala Drozdowski, Monica Isabella (CPSO#: 108070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primrose Family Medical Centre
35 Primrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1R 0A1
Phone: (613) 230-7788
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA ISABELLA SOBALA DROZDOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOBALA DROZDOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017