Soberman, Dov David (CPSO#: 65026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Hospital - Grace Div.
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2600
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Hospital - General Div.
3050 Lawrence Ave. East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-8181
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dov Soberman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Soberman ( CPSO# 65026 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital - Grace Div.
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2550

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital - General Div.
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8181

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOV DAVID SOBERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOBERMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993