Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sobol, Isaac Harry (CPSO#: 56280)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 30 Jun 1985 to 01 Jul 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 31 Aug 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012