Soccar, Esther Armya Mansour (CPSO#: 69177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 102
3029 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 8E8
Phone: (613) 596-6006
Fax: (613) 596-3954
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Esther Soccar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Soccar ( CPSO# 69177 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
3029 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 8E8
Phone Number: (613) 596-6006

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESTHER ARMYA MANSOUR SOCCAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOCCAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1997