Sochowski, Randall Albert (CPSO#: 52932)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1995