Soderman, Robert Mark (CPSO#: 42722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
R R 1
41953 Sparta Line
Union ON  N0L 2L0
Phone: (519) 631-0985
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.M. Soderman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Soderman ( CPSO# 42722 )

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Business Address:
41953 Sparta Line
R.R. #1
Union ON  N0L 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 631-0985

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MARK SODERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SODERMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1984