Soenen, Gary Maynard (CPSO#: 52959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
216 West Street
Suite 202
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S8
Phone: (519) 426-3366
Fax: (519) 426-3267
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary Soenen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Soenen ( CPSO# 52959 )

Business Address:
202 - 216 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S8
Phone Number: (519) 426-3366

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY MAYNARD SOENEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOENEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1998