Sogbein, Olusola Olufemi (CPSO#: 86906)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 11 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 May 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 May 2013
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 May 2013
Summary:

On May 13, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Olusola Olufemi Sogbein committed 
an act of professional misconduct in that:   he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; and in that 
he engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician. Dr. Sogbein admitted the allegations.  
 
Dr. Sogbein is a postgraduate medical student at a University and holds a certificate of 
registration authorizing postgraduate education, issued on July 1, 2007. 
 
On August 31, 2007, Dr. Sogbein was stopped by police who were notified of a concern 
regarding his driving. He was issued a caution for passing off the roadway Dr. Sogbein pulled his 
car beside that of the complainants and made a comment to the effect of wanting to get a good 
look at their faces so if they ever come into an emergency room where he is working he won't 
help them.  
 
On August 16, 2008, Dr. Sogbein was arrested and charged with causing a disturbance arising 
from a traffic stop. He was rude, made derogatory comments and was intimidating towards the 
female officer who stopped him. The Cause Disturbance Charge was ultimately withdrawn.  
 
On April 16, 2009, Dr. Sogbein was involved in an incident involving Nurse A and Patient A at 
Hospital Y. Nurse A made an unintentional comment related to Dr. Sogbein's skin colour in the 
context of a clinical inquiry. Dr. Sogbein became angry further to Nurse A's comment. In 
reaction, he opened a curtain surrounding Patient A's bed, thereby potentially exposing Patient A 
to the hall and to any passersby, including exposing her groin wound and vaginal area. Nurse A 
provided an apology to him and was sent to training. Dr. Sogbein's privileges to continue his 
postgraduate education at the Hospital were terminated on April 30, 2009. He was required to 
participate in a remediation program focusing on anger management; communication skills; 
medical content knowledge and professionalism. After a successful remediation period, his 
privileges were re-instated in December 2009.   
 
On September 15, 2010, Dr. Sogbein pled guilty and was convicted of driving a motor vehicle on 
a highway while his driver's license was under suspension. He received a $1000 fine and a 
further six months driving suspension. On October 10, 2010, Dr. Sogbein pled guilty and was 
convicted of operating a motor vehicle on a highway in a manner that was dangerous to the 
public on September 20, 2009. He received a $1000 fine and a one year driving prohibition.  
 
Dr. Sogbein began a residency program at Hospital Z in April of 2012. During his Internal Care 
Unit rotation, Dr. Sogbein was disrespectful and unprofessional in his interactions an ICU 
Pharmacist (subsequently and unprompted he admitted to her that he had been wrong), with an 
ICU Ward Clerk, with an ICU nurse who was inquiring about pacer pads, nursing staff on June 
24, 2012, a cable installer on June 27, 2012, and on June 19, 2012, he discontinued orders for a 
patient issued by the Chief of Medicine and Critical Care without reviewing the issue with the 
ordering physician or the attending physician.  
 
The University suspended Dr. Sogbein from clinical duties effective July 9, 2012 for 
unprofessional behaviour.  
The Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      the Registrar suspend Dr. Sogbein's certificate of registration for a period of four months, 
      commencing June 1, 2013.  
 
      the following terms, conditions and limitations be imposed on Dr. Sogbein's certificate of 
      registration authorizing postgraduate education: 
 
      a)    Dr. Olusola Olufemi Sogbein shall practice in a group setting (that includes other 
            physicians) only; 
 
      b)    Dr. Olusola Olufemi Sogbein shall advise the College in writing, immediately, if 
            he is charged with any provincial or criminal offense; 
 
      c)    Dr. Olusola Olufemi Sogbein shall, at his own expense: 
 
            (i)   practise under a workplace monitoring arrangement approved by the 
                  College, with quarterly reports to the College; 
            (ii)  participate in individual or group counselling sessions as approved by the 
                  College, with quarterly reports to the College and  
            (iii) enter into an agreement with the Physician Workplace Support Program 
                  (PWSP), with quarterly reports to the College and shall comply with the 
                  PWSP recommendations.   
 
      d)    Dr. Sogbein shall consent to information-sharing/reporting between the College 
            and the workplace monitors, the counsellors and the PWSP, as well as any other 
            persons necessary in order for the College to receive information relevant to his 
            compliance with these or any other terms of the order.   
 
      Dr. Sogbein appear before the panel to be reprimanded.  
 
      Dr. Sogbein pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 by August 13, 2013. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 13, 2013