Sogbein, Solomon Kolawole (CPSO#: 42490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone: (705) 474-1884
Fax: (705) 474-6261
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Kolawole Sogbein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sogbein ( CPSO# 42490 )

Business Address:
401 - 1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone Number: (705) 474-1884

Business Address:
Mattawa Hospital
217 Turcotte Park Road
Mattawa ON  P0H 1V0
Phone Number: (705) 744-5511

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 18 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOLOMON KOLAWOLE SOGBEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOGBEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1983