Sogbesan, Enitan Adedolapo (CPSO#: 83021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Lagos, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Regional Eye Institute, King Campus
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 552-1155 Ext. 38313
Fax: (905) 573-4810
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster University Medical Center
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 72400
Fax: (905) 521-2332
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.A. Sogbesan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sogbesan ( CPSO# 83021 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
King's Campus
Regional Eye Institute
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ENITAN ADEDOLAPO SOGBESAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOGBESAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2005 to 30 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009