Sohi, Herpreet Singh (CPSO#: 63753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 504
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 782-2616
Fax: (416) 782-5899
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Herpreet Sohi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sohi ( CPSO# 63753 )
Dr. R. Sohi ( CPSO# 66921 )

Business Address:
Suite 504
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 782-2616

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HERPREET SINGH SOHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOHI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992