Sohi, Paul Singh (CPSO#: 60015)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002