Sohi, Ravinder Kaur (CPSO#: 66921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1995


Former Name: Bajwa, Ravinder Kaur (used until: 14 Jan 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Alberta, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga ON  L4X 2Z9
Phone: (905) 625-4016
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Herpreet Sohi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2015

Dr. H. Sohi ( CPSO# 63753 )
Dr. R. Sohi ( CPSO# 66921 )

Business Address:
Suite 504
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 782-2616

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. RAVINDER KAUR SOHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1995