Sohn, Brenda (CPSO#: 86564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 140
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W2
Phone: (416) 286-3830
Fax: (416) 286-3133
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brenda Sohn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sohn ( CPSO# 86564 )

Business Address:
Unit 140
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 286-3830

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDA SOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2012