Sohn, Melanie (CPSO#: 87103)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 14 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2015