Sojka, Stanislaw Jerzy Marcin (CPSO#: 52613)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1120 North 103rd Plaza
Suite100
Omaha NE  68114
United States
Phone: (402) 391-5055
Fax: (402) 391-5053

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Iowa
USA - Nebraska

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANISLAW JERZY MARCIN SOJKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOJKA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1985