Sokar-Todd, Hanan Benjamin (CPSO#: 88539)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Units 10-14 Suite 107
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone: (905) 630-5988
Fax: (905) 635-5805
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Sokar-Todd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sokar-Todd ( CPSO# 88539 )

Business Address:
Suite 107
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 630-5988

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANAN BENJAMIN SOKAR-TODD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOKAR-TODD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010