Sokolon, Daryl George (CPSO#: 59784)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 876-4509
Fax: (705) 743-1449
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daryl Sokolon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sokolon ( CPSO# 59784 )

Business Address:
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 876-4509

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARYL GEORGE SOKOLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOKOLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1989