Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sokolov, Stephen Thomas Harold (CPSO#: 59135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and Mental
Health
Room 1148
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34521
Fax: (416) 979-6815
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Sokolov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 21 2014


Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Sokolov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sokolov ( CPSO# 59135 )
Dr. E. Rea ( CPSO# 59812 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Room 1148
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN THOMAS HAROLD SOKOLOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOKOLOV is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1992