Sokoluk, Craig Allan (CPSO#: 61154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
K 407
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 778-9692
Fax: (416) 778-7669
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Craig Sokoluk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sokoluk ( CPSO# 61154 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Room K-407
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 778-9692

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 20 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRAIG ALLAN SOKOLUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOKOLUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1993