Sole, Joseph Nicholas (CPSO#: 19124)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 07 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Oct 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1964
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 07 Oct 1999

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Oct 1999
Summary:

 On October 6, 1999, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Sole(s guilty plea and found him guilty 
 of professional misconduct.  Subsequently, the Committee ordered his certificate of registration 
 be revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 06, 1999