Soliman, Hany (CPSO#: 82983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Sunnybrook Cancer Centre
Room T2-171
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4951
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hany Soliman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Soliman ( CPSO# 82983 )

Business Address:
Odette Sunnybrook Cancer Centre
Room T2-171
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANY SOLIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLIMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2011