Soliman, Soliman Rizk (CPSO#: 81863)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 06 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 07 Nov 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2006