Sollazzo, David Jeffrey (CPSO#: 88540)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Emergency Department (Room S1.184)
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58097
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Sollazzo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sollazzo ( CPSO# 88540 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Charlton Campus
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
William Osler Health Center
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JEFFREY SOLLAZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLLAZZO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010