Sollazzo, John Nicholas (CPSO#: 86684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2757 King St. East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34812
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sollazzo & Palombo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sollazzo ( CPSO# 86684 )
Dr. A. Palombo ( CPSO# 86647 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
38 - 2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 792-2211

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN NICHOLAS SOLLAZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLLAZZO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009